TN SB2904 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/18/2020
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires county clerks to retain $3.00 of the $11.00 fee for noting liens, encumbrances, or mortgages on a certificate of title; requires the retained funds to be earmarked for office supplies and equipment related to the notations. - Amends TCA Section 55-6-101.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires county clerks to retain $3.00 of the $11.00 fee for noting liens, encumbrances, or mortgages on a certificate of title; requires the retained funds to be earmarked for office supplies and equipment related to the notations. - Amends TCA Section 55-6-101.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11SenateAction deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/18/2020
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/11/2020
2020-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
2020-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1720 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback