TN SB2885 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/25/2020
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/25/2020
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department of human services to report to the speakers of the senate and house of representatives by January 31 of each year the aggregate number of administrative orders the department issued during the previous calendar year for overdue child support in cases where the children receive assistance under a state program funded by the federal Social Security Act. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 16; Title 24; Title 36; Title 37 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, requires the department of human services to report to the speakers of the senate and house of representatives by January 31 of each year the aggregate number of administrative orders the department issued during the previous calendar year for overdue child support in cases where the children receive assistance under a state program funded by the federal Social Security Act. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 16; Title 24; Title 36; Title 37 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/25/2020 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2782 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.