TN SB2883 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases from three years to four years the amount of time a scrap metal dealer must maintain a thumb or fingerprint impression taken from a person proposing to sell scrap metal. - Amends TCA Title 55 and Title 62.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 55 and Title 62, relative to catalytic converters.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2684 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee