TN SB2879 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 854
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 854
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires an employer to allow a veteran employee to have the entirety of Veterans' Day as a non-paid holiday if certain conditions met; specifies that this act does not prohibit an employer from allowing the employer's veteran employees to have the entirety of Veterans Day as a paid holiday. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 15; Title 50 and Title 58.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 15; Title 50 and Title 58, relative to Veterans' Day.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Frank Niceley [R] |
Sen. Shane Reeves [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 854 | |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/7/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/15/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2733 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-25 - Effective date(s) 04/20/2022