TN SB2876 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires certain insurance policies or contracts that cover pregnancy and maternity benefits to cover benefits of perinatal educational courses, at no cost, for mothers, fathers, and one other person designated by the mother; requires insurance providers required to provide such benefits to provide information about such courses on their website. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 56 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 56 and Title 71, relative to perinatal insurance benefits.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2962 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-12 - Failed in s/c Insurance Subcommittee of Insurance Committee