TN SB2855 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows electronic submission of the report that an association formed under the provisions governing sheep producers indemnity must file with the commissioner. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 12; Title 13; Title 42; Title 43; Title 44; Title 45; Title 46; Title 47; Title 48; Title 50; Title 53; Title 54; Title 55; Title 56; Title 61; Title 62; Title 65; Title 66; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, allows electronic submission of the report that an association formed under the provisions governing sheep producers indemnity must file with the commissioner. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 12; Title 13; Title 42; Title 43; Title 44; Title 45; Title 46; Title 47; Title 48; Title 50; Title 53; Title 54; Title 55; Title 56; Title 61; Title 62; Title 65; Title 66; Title 67 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 12/1/2020 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 6/2/2020 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2871 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-03 - Taken off notice for cal. in Commerce Committee