TN SB2843 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 753
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 753
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions regarding statements that must be included in health club agreement. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18, Part 3.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions regarding statements that must be included in health club agreement. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18, Part 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Pub. Ch. 753 | |
2020-07-02 | Effective date(s) 06/22/2020 | |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-06-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-16 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-06-16 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0849) |
2020-06-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-06-11 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0703) |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 6/8/2020 |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 6/2/2020 |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Commerce & Labor Comm. 6/2/20 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 6/2/2020 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2859 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 753