TN SB2837 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the dyslexia advisory council to submit the council's annual report to the education committee of the senate and the education instruction committee of the house of representatives electronically. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9 and Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 9 and Title 49, relative to education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2784 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-15 - Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee