TN SB2826 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 752
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 752
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions and specifies application of the Local Tourism Development Zone Business Tax Act. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 88, Part 1 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 30.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions and specifies application of the Local Tourism Development Zone Business Tax Act. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 88, Part 1 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 30.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 7 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Pub. Ch. 752 | |
2020-07-02 | Effective date(s) 06/22/2020 | |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-06-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-10 | House | Passed H., Ayes 72, Nays 8, PNV 9 |
2020-06-10 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0865) |
2020-06-10 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0812) |
2020-06-10 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-06-08 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0681) |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 6/4/2020 |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 6/2/2020 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2111 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 752