TN SB2814 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases from $1.00 to $5.00 the minimum fine that may be assessed against an executor or administrator of an estate who is convicted of neglecting or refusing to appear before the clerk of the probate court and settle the accounts. - Amends TCA Title 30; Title 31 and Title 32.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 30; Title 31 and Title 32, relative to estates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 1 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/19/2022 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/12/2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 1 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1962 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-04 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration