TN SB2812 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that a list be available for free on the department of human services' website of the requirements in federal statutes and the standards established by the department for assistance under the Food Stamp Act of 1971 to be granted to needy persons and families. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 49 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, requires that a list be available for free on the department of human services' website of the requirements in federal statutes and the standards established by the department for assistance under the Food Stamp Act of 1971 to be granted to needy persons and families. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 49 and Title 71.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2629 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.