TN SB2781 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits a state institution of higher education from discriminating against a student based on the political viewpoint expressed by the student; prohibits an institution from penalizing, rewarding, or grading a student's coursework based on the political viewpoint expressed by the student; authorizes a student to pursue a cause of action against an institution for discriminating against the student based on the political viewpoint expressed by the student. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, prohibits a state institution of higher education from discriminating against a student based on the political viewpoint expressed by the student; prohibits an institution from penalizing, rewarding, or grading a student's coursework based on the political viewpoint expressed by the student; authorizes a student to pursue a cause of action against an institution for discriminating against the student based on the political viewpoint expressed by the student. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2438 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-28 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Committee