TN SB2753 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 60
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 60
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, rewrites town charter. - Amends Chapter 148 of the Private Acts of 1923; as amended.
Title
Subject to local approval, rewrites town charter. - Amends Chapter 148 of the Private Acts of 1923; as amended.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 60 | |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar calendar for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bills |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2721 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Pr. Ch. 60