TN SB2747 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases, from 45 to 50 days, the time a person who submitted plans for the construction of, or a change to, a solid waste processing facility or disposal facility must wait for action by the commissioner of environment and conservation before the person may appeal to the underground storage tanks and solid waste disposal control board, as though notice of disapproval were received at the expiration of that time. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 7; Title 49; Title 55 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5; Title 7; Title 49; Title 55 and Title 68, relative to solid waste.
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee to 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2558 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-01 - Failed in s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee of Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee