TN SB2747 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires nonpartisan elections for county officials in Henry County upon approval by referendum. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 1.
Title
As introduced, requires nonpartisan elections for county officials in Henry County upon approval by referendum. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar calendar for 4/16/2018 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bills |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2717 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-16 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2747&ga=110 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Bill/SB2747.pdf |