TN SB2746 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-13 - Pub. Ch. 607
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-13 - Pub. Ch. 607
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds the offenses of promoting the prostitution of a minor and patronizing prostitution from a person who is younger than 18 years of age or has an intellectual disability as sexual offenses for which a person may not qualify for judicial diversion. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As enacted, adds the offenses of promoting the prostitution of a minor and patronizing prostitution from a person who is younger than 18 years of age or has an intellectual disability as sexual offenses for which a person may not qualify for judicial diversion. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-13 | Pub. Ch. 607 | |
2020-04-13 | Effective date(s) 03/20/2020 | |
2020-03-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-03-12 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-03-12 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-03-09 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/5/2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2069 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 607