TN SB2740 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a Class E felony offense for a person who witnesses a sexual offense to coerce or influence the victim to not report the offense to law enforcement, provide false information to law enforcement, or withhold any truthful information, document, or thing from law enforcement. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 5; Title 39, Chapter 16 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 5; Title 39, Chapter 16 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 3, relative to victims of sexual offenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2939 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee