TN SB2739 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Effective date(s) 05/03/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Effective date(s) 05/03/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the department of children's services and the department of human services to collaborate to provide recommendations to the general assembly on resources and services specific to persons from 18 to 24 years of age who have been victims of child sex trafficking. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 37; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 37; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 71, relative to victims of child sex trafficking.
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn White [R] | Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] |
Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Effective date(s) 05/03/2022 | |
2022-05-06 | Pub. Ch. 983 | |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-19 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-18 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-04-18 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0887) |
2022-04-18 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-04-18 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0896) |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/14/2022 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2591 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 983