TN SB2739 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Pub. Ch. 694
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Pub. Ch. 694
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, permits the state, through the attorney general, to seek an injunction against a person who commits harassment against a state employee. - Amends TCA Title 50.
Title
As enacted, permits the state, through the attorney general, to seek an injunction against a person who commits harassment against a state employee. - Amends TCA Title 50.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Pub. Ch. 694 | |
2020-06-30 | Effective date(s) 06/11/2020 | |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-06-03 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-01 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2020-06-01 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-03-09 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/5/2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1707 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 694