TN SB2738 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 51
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 51
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, prohibits the mayor and aldermen from being eligible for the succeeding term in the same office if such official has served more than one-half of a four-year term and the next two subsequent four-year terms, for a maximum of 10 years in that particular office. - Amends Chapter 67 of the Private Acts of 1953.
Title
Subject to local approval, prohibits the mayor and aldermen from being eligible for the succeeding term in the same office if such official has served more than one-half of a four-year term and the next two subsequent four-year terms, for a maximum of 10 years in that particular office. - Amends Chapter 67 of the Private Acts of 1953.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 51 | |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2709 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-04 - Pr. Ch. 51