TN SB2696 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, designates the Holy Bible as the official state book. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 1.
Title
As introduced, designates the Holy Bible as the official state book. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] | Sen. Steve Southerland [R] | Sen. Frank Niceley [R] | Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2778 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-17 - H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/18/2020