TN SB2691 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates a presumption that a public safety employee diagnosed with post-traumatic stress disorder (PTSD) sustained the injury in the line of duty for purposes of workers' compensation; expands definition of public safety employee. - Amends TCA Title 7; Title 8; Title 33; Title 50, Chapter 6 and Title 56.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, creates a presumption that a public safety employee diagnosed with post-traumatic stress disorder (PTSD) sustained the injury in the line of duty for purposes of workers' compensation; expands definition of public safety employee. - Amends TCA Title 7; Title 8; Title 33; Title 50, Chapter 6 and Title 56.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
2020-03-10SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/17/2020
2020-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2020-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2577 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Placed on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 3/16/2020

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback