TN SB2689 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 66
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 66
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, moves the date of the city election to coincide with the August general county election; extends the four-year terms of office of the mayor and council members elected at the regular city elections held in September 2013 and September 2015 that are set to expire in 2017 and 2019, respectively. - Amends Chapter 31 of the Private Acts of 2009.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, moves the date of the city election to coincide with the August general county election; extends the four-year terms of office of the mayor and council members elected at the regular city elections held in September 2013 and September 2015 that are set to expire in 2017 and 2019, respectively. - Amends Chapter 31 of the Private Acts of 2009.
Sponsors
Sen. Mae Beavers [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 66 | |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar calendar for 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2664 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-17 - Pr. Ch. 66