TN SB2682 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, expands the offenses for which certain items may be seized utilizing criminal asset forfeiture; revises provision regarding disposition of forfeited property. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 16; Title 17; Title 19; Title 20; Title 29; Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 16; Title 17; Title 19; Title 20; Title 29; Title 39 and Title 40, relative to the administration of justice.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 2 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 1 (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY OGLES PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 1 (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY OGLES PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2022 | |
2022-05-06 | Pub. Ch. 982 | |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-19 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 25, Nays 0 (Amendment 2 - HA0907) |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 24, Nays 1 (Amendment 1 - HA0875) |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/14/2022 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/13/2022 |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-04-11 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0907) |
2022-04-11 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0875) |
2022-04-11 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-03-24 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 1 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0611) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/21/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2271 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 982