TN SB2663 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires adult cabarets and adult-oriented establishments to post a notice on the inside and outside of each bathroom door and door used by customers or patrons to enter or exit the facility that provides the contact information for the Tennessee Human Trafficking Resource Center Hotline established and maintained by the Tennessee bureau of investigation. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 51, Part 14.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 7, Chapter 51, Part 14, relative to adult-oriented establishments.
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn White [R] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Sen. Sara Kyle [D] | Sen. Page Walley [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2024 | |
2024-04-08 | Pub. Ch. 653 | |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-03-25 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-03-21 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-03-21 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-03-18 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/14/2024 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/11/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1848 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 653