TN SB2661 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department of safety to establish and implement a secure digital license system for the issuance of digital driver licenses and photo identification licenses upon request. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 50, Part 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 55, Chapter 50, Part 3, relative to digital licenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/21/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2792 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee