TN SB2661 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Pub. Ch. 640
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the "National Motto in the Classroom Act," which requires each local education agency to display the national motto, "In God We Trust," in a prominent location in each school. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, enacts the "National Motto in the Classroom Act," which requires each local education agency to display the national motto, "In God We Trust," in a prominent location in each school. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 81 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-06 Pub. Ch. 640
2018-04-06 Effective date(s) 04/02/2018
2018-04-02SenateSigned by Governor.
2018-03-22SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2018-03-22HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-03-21SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-03-20SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2018-03-19HousePassed H., Ayes 81, Nays 8, PNV 2
2018-03-19HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0898)
2018-03-19HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2018-03-08HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2018-03-06SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2018-03-05SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 0
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/5/2018
2018-02-28SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/28/2018
2018-02-05SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-02-01SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2368 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 640

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback