TN SB2660 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows home school students to participate in extracurricular activities at the public school in which the students are zoned to attend. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-3050.
Title
As introduced, allows home school students to participate in extracurricular activities at the public school in which the students are zoned to attend. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-3050.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/21/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2320 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-20 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning