TN SB2658 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the TACIR to conduct a study of the County Powers Relief Act and report its findings to the state and local government committee of the senate and the local government committee of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 29.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 29, relative to revenue from development.
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2608 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Government Committee