TN SB2651 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases the time, from 30 to 35 days, that a person has to request a hearing on an order from the commissioner of environment and conservation alleging a violation related to withdrawing water without a valid registration before the commissioner's order becomes final. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 11; Title 12; Title 21; Title 28; Title 29; Title 35; Title 43; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48; Title 59; Title 60; Title 61; Title 62; Title 65; Title 66; Title 67; Title 68; Title 69 and Title 70.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 11; Title 12; Title 21; Title 28; Title 29; Title 35; Title 43; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48; Title 59; Title 60; Title 61; Title 62; Title 65; Title 66; Title 67; Title 68; Title 69 and Title 70, relative to natural resources.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2796 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-05 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.