TN SB2649 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 26
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 26
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, authorizes the compensation of the mayor and councilmen to be determined by ordinance; clarifies which actions by the city council must be done by ordinance; adds requirements for resolutions of the city council; prohibits members of the city council from holding other elected public office or to be an employee of the city; authorizes the mayor to serve as the purchasing agent. - Amends Chapter 127 of the Private Acts of 2006.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, authorizes the compensation of the mayor and councilmen to be determined by ordinance; clarifies which actions by the city council must be done by ordinance; adds requirements for resolutions of the city council; prohibits members of the city council from holding other elected public office or to be an employee of the city; authorizes the mayor to serve as the purchasing agent. - Amends Chapter 127 of the Private Acts of 2006.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 26 | |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar calendar for 3/7/2016 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2626 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-08 - Pr. Ch. 26