TN SB2648 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-08 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Trans. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-08 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Trans. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires approval of TDOT to place traffic surveillance camera on state highway based on engineering study paid by local government seeking use of such camera. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8.
Title
As introduced, requires approval of TDOT to place traffic surveillance camera on state highway based on engineering study paid by local government seeking use of such camera. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Trans. Comm. | |
2010-03-23 | Action Def. in S. Trans Comm. to 3/30/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm. | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-20 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2489 (Crossfiled) 2010-01-27 - Assigned to s/c Public Safety of TR
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2648&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB2648.pdf |