TN SB2643 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-12 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-12 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the use of weighted voting, the use of barcodes and Quick Response codes on ballots, and any other type of fractional cumulative voting in statewide and local elections in this state; requires the administrator of elections of each county to implement a biennial review system for purposes of compliance and certify compliance to the coordinator of elections. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
As introduced, prohibits the use of weighted voting, the use of barcodes and Quick Response codes on ballots, and any other type of fractional cumulative voting in statewide and local elections in this state; requires the administrator of elections of each county to implement a biennial review system for purposes of compliance and certify compliance to the coordinator of elections. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | Senate | Withdrawn. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Recalled from Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2643&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/SB2643.pdf |