TN SB2642 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-12 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-12 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a county administrator of elections to make available to that county's election commissioners all election-related information held by the county administrator of elections during regular business hours; requires the state election commission to promulgate rules providing standard operating procedures regarding election day procedures and chain of custody of election records. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 11 and Title 2, Chapter 12.
Title
As introduced, requires a county administrator of elections to make available to that county's election commissioners all election-related information held by the county administrator of elections during regular business hours; requires the state election commission to promulgate rules providing standard operating procedures regarding election day procedures and chain of custody of election records. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 11 and Title 2, Chapter 12.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | Senate | Withdrawn. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Recalled from Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2642&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/SB2642.pdf |