TN SB2641 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits private employers with 50 or more employees and public employers from making employment decisions with regard to an applicant or current employee based on wage or salary history. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 12 and Title 50.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, prohibits private employers with 50 or more employees and public employers from making employment decisions with regard to an applicant or current employee based on wage or salary history. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 12 and Title 50.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-03SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 12/1/2020
2020-05-27SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 6/2/2020
2020-03-17SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
2020-03-10SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/17/2020
2020-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2020-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2545 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-04 - Taken off notice for cal. in Consumer and Human Resources Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback