TN SB2636 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a planning commission to plan for the celebration during calendar year 2018 of the life, legacy, and accomplishments of Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr.
Title
As introduced, creates a planning commission to plan for the celebration during calendar year 2018 of the life, legacy, and accomplishments of Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/28/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2087 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee