TN SB2633 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 996
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, makes various changes to present law on adoption and foster parents. - Amends TCA Title 36 and Title 37.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36 and Title 37, relative to children.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-29 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 996
2024-04-22SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2024-04-22SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2024-04-19SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/22/2024
2024-02-20SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 2
2024-02-15SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/20/2024
2024-02-15SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in Senate Judiciary Committee 2/20/2024
2024-02-05SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2024-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2024-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2644 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-29 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback