TN SB2633 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, holds a private employer that requires an employee to receive a vaccination against COVID-19 as a condition to continued employment liable for damages resulting to the employee from an adverse reaction to the vaccination. - Amends TCA Title 14; Title 29; Title 49; Title 50; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 14; Title 29; Title 49; Title 50; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to COVID-19.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2713 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-15 - Sponsor change.