TN SB2633 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases from $10,000 or more to $25,000 or more, the amount for which a local board of education or the governing body of a public charter school must make purchases or expenditures by competitive bids; requires the amount to be increased each fiscal year, beginning with the 2021-2022 fiscal year, by the greater of 2 percent or the rate of inflation. - Amends TCA Section 12-3-1212; Section 49-13-111 and Section 49-2-203.
Title
As introduced, increases from $10,000 or more to $25,000 or more, the amount for which a local board of education or the governing body of a public charter school must make purchases or expenditures by competitive bids; requires the amount to be increased each fiscal year, beginning with the 2021-2022 fiscal year, by the greater of 2 percent or the rate of inflation. - Amends TCA Section 12-3-1212; Section 49-13-111 and Section 49-2-203.
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 12/1/2020 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 6/3/2020 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2589 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-15 - Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee