TN SB2631 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Effective date(s) 06/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Effective date(s) 06/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that a student who graduates early from an eligible high school, or who completes high school at an eligible home school early, or who obtains an equivalency diploma before the spring semester immediately preceding the student's initial fall enrollment, and is admitted to, and enrolled full time in, an eligible postsecondary program, is eligible for the Tennessee promise scholarship. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 4, relative to the Tennessee Promise scholarship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Effective date(s) 06/01/2022 | |
2022-06-03 | Pub. Ch. 1125 | |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-05-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-27 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-04-27 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0804) |
2022-04-27 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-04-11 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0767) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/7/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/23/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2436 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1125