TN SB2618 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department of mental health and substance abuse services to use federal funds received for the treatment of COVID-19 to purchase and distribute COVID-19 resources kits to indigents upon request. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 58 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 58 and Title 68, relative to COVID-19.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2507 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee