TN SB2618 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., & Nat. Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., & Nat. Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioner of environment and conservation to establish water quality-based effluent limits for facilities where certain municipally owned sewage treatment plant expansion projects may occur. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 221 and Title 69.
Title
As introduced, requires the commissioner of environment and conservation to establish water quality-based effluent limits for facilities where certain municipally owned sewage treatment plant expansion projects may occur. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 221 and Title 69.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., & Nat. Resources |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/8/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2614 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-20 - Taken off notice for cal. in Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee