TN SB2615 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends, from 10 to 15 days, the period of time within which a Model 2 seller must correct an error in its certified automated system used to determine tax due on its sales and leases in order to be exempt from additional tax liability. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, extends, from 10 to 15 days, the period of time within which a Model 2 seller must correct an error in its certified automated system used to determine tax due on its sales and leases in order to be exempt from additional tax liability. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2374 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee