TN SB2611 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1086
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1086
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases the classification of the offense statutory rape by an authority figure from a Class C felony to a Class B felony; revises certain elements of the offense. - Amends TCA Section 39-13-532.
Title
As enacted, increases the classification of the offense statutory rape by an authority figure from a Class C felony to a Class B felony; revises certain elements of the offense. - Amends TCA Section 39-13-532.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-18 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-24 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1086 | |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/20/2016 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/20/2016 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee3 calendar for 4/13/2016 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/13/2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee3 calendar for 4/12/2016 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/30/2016 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/30/2016 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2016 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/29/2016 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2399 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-24 - Pub. Ch. 1086