TN SB2610 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-15 - Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-15 - Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows certain retail and other businesses a deduction from business taxes for the installation of electric vehicle chargers. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 7.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 7, relative to a tax deduction for businesses through the voluntary installation of electric vehicle chargers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | Senate | Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2654 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee