TN SB2607 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-18 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, deletes an obsolete reference for a person who possesses a Class I carnivore prior to July 1, 2015, and who continues to possess the animal on or after July 1, 2015, to have a compliant microchip implanted in the animal by July 1, 2018. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 14, Part 2; Title 43; Title 44; Title 63, Chapter 12 and Title 70.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 14, Part 2; Title 43; Title 44; Title 63, Chapter 12 and Title 70, relative to microchips in animals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-18SenateWithdrawn.
2024-03-15SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2024
2024-03-06SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2024-02-28SenatePlaced on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/6/2024
2024-02-05SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
2024-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2024-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2738 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-05 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback