TN SB2602 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Effective date(s) 06/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Effective date(s) 06/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires TACIR to prepare a report surveying projects initiated over the past 10 years involving the initiation of new state-sponsored Amtrak intercity passenger rail. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 10; Title 4, Chapter 23; Title 7; Title 9; Title 54; Title 55; Title 64 and Title 65.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 10; Title 4, Chapter 23; Title 7; Title 9; Title 54; Title 55; Title 64 and Title 65, relative to passenger rail transportation.
Sponsors
Sen. Heidi Campbell [D] | Sen. Jon Lundberg [R] | Sen. Brenda Gilmore [D] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] |
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 80 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Effective date(s) 06/01/2022 | |
2022-06-03 | Pub. Ch. 1124 | |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-05-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-27 | House | Passed H., Ayes 80, Nays 7, PNV 2 |
2022-04-27 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0600) |
2022-04-27 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-03-17 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0541) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/14/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2278 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1124