TN SB2601 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes the time when the commissioner of labor and workforce development must make a January report to the general assembly concerning the condition of the unemployment trust fund from the first week of the month to the second week of the month. - Amends TCA Title 50.
Title
As introduced, changes the time when the commissioner of labor and workforce development must make a January report to the general assembly concerning the condition of the unemployment trust fund from the first week of the month to the second week of the month. - Amends TCA Title 50.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2641 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee