TN SB2596 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department to develop a plan to be submitted to the general assembly to ensure that two-thirds of all grant and loan money distributed by the department is distributed to rural counties. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 7 and Title 9.
Title
As introduced, requires the department to develop a plan to be submitted to the general assembly to ensure that two-thirds of all grant and loan money distributed by the department is distributed to rural counties. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 7 and Title 9.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1586 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee