TN SB2594 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioner to report certain information regarding teacher license renewal requirement waivers submitted to the commissioner by teachers who, on each of their last three evaluations, received an overall performance effectiveness level of "significantly above expectations." - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 3 and Title 49, Chapter 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 3 and Title 49, Chapter 5, relative to educator licensure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2513 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-08 - Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee